VA HB2019 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Port Authority; exemptions from the Public Procurement Act. Adds (i) conveyance and transfers of real property by state agencies and (ii) temporary transfers of use of property between state agencies and lease to private entities to the list of exemptions for the Virginia Port Authority. The bill also allows the Board of Commissioners of the Authority to approve policies in order for the Authority to have specified exemptions from the Public Procurement Act. Current law allows these exemptions only with Board approval of regulations. The bill requires the Virginia Port Authority to develop policies or adopt regulations for the implementation of the bill's provisions no later than January 1, 2017, prior to which date the Authority may exercise the authority granted by the bill subject to the approval of the Secretary of Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Port Authority; additional exemptions from the Public Procurement Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0175)
2015-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 175 (effective 7/1/15 see bill)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2019ER)
2015-02-24HouseEnrolled
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-17SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
2015-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2015-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-03HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2015-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2015-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 15101368D-E
2015-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2019E
2015-02-02HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2015-02-02HouseRead second time
2015-01-30HouseRead first time
2015-01-28HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2015-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2015-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101368D

Same As/Similar To

SB1359 (Same As) 2015-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
621132.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2019
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2019+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2019E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2019ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0175+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H0210V0003+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H02V0017+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV1817+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S05V0235+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0559HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0615HB2019+HB2019

Bill Comments 750

feedback