VA HB2019 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0301)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; policies and regulations. Requires that a current copy of all school division policies and regulations approved by the local school board must be posted on the division's website and available to employees and to the public. Printed copies of such policies and regulations are required to be available as needed to citizens who do not have online access.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; policies and regulations approved by local school board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0301)
2013-03-13 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 301 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-22SenateSigned by President
2013-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2019ER)
2013-02-21HouseEnrolled
2013-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-18SenateRead third time
2013-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2013-02-11SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2013-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2013-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 13101723D-E
2013-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2019E
2013-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2013-02-01HouseRead second time
2013-01-31HouseRead first time
2013-01-30HouseReported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
2013-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
2013-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
2013-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2013-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101723D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB2019
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2019+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2019E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB2019ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+CHAP0301+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H0903V0019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+H09V0112+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+HV0467+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+S04V0198+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0597HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+vot+SV0631HB2019+HB2019

Bill Comments 750

feedback