VA HB2018 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Veterans Services; membership. Increases from 11 to 14 the number of nonlegislative citizen members on the Board of Veterans Services, thereby increasing the total membership of the Board from 19 to 22. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Veterans Services, Board of; increases membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0319) | |
2015-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 319 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2018ER) |
2015-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101249D |