VA HB2013 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - Left in Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Probation, revocation, and suspension of sentence; penalty. Makes changes to the definition of a technical violation as it pertains to the revocation of suspension of sentence and probation. The bill also provides that upon a first technical violation, if the court originally suspended the imposition of sentence, the court shall revoke such suspension and again suspend all of this sentence and upon a second or subsequent violation, the court may pronounce whatever sentence might have been originally imposed. The bill also specifies that a violation of a term or condition included in the definition of technical violation shall not be considered a special or specific term or condition for sentencing purposes. Probation, revocation, and suspension of sentence; penalty. Makes changes to the definition of a technical violation as it pertains to the revocation of suspension of sentence and probation. The bill also provides that upon a first technical violation, if the court originally suspended the imposition of sentence, the court shall revoke such suspension and again suspend all of this sentence and upon a second or subsequent violation, the court may pronounce whatever sentence might have been originally imposed. The bill also specifies that a violation of a term or condition included in the definition of technical violation shall not be considered a special or specific term or condition for sentencing purposes. The bill also provides that the court may fix the period of probation and the period of suspension for up to the statutory maximum period for which the defendant might originally have been sentenced to be imposed for any felony offense and up to two years for an offense punishable as a Class 1 or Class 2 misdemeanor. Currently, the limitation on periods of probation and periods of suspension is up to the statutory maximum period of imprisonment for any offense. The bill also adds the offense of crimes against nature committed on or after July 1, 2023, to the list of offenses for which if some period of the sentence for such offense is suspended, the judge is required to order that period of suspension be for the length of time equal to the statutory maximum period for which the defendant might originally have been sentenced to be imprisoned.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Probation, revocation, and suspension of sentence; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 7-N) (Y: 9 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N) (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateLeft in Judiciary
2023-02-22SenateRecommitted to Judiciary
2023-02-22SenateMotion to recommit to committee agreed to (22-Y 18-N)
2023-02-22SenateRead third time
2023-02-21SenatePassed by for the day
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (9-Y 7-N)
2023-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2023-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 23107002D-S1
2023-02-15SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2023-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
2023-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
2023-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-02-05HouseRead first time
2023-02-03HouseReported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 9-N)
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2023-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100750D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192303(n/a)See Bill Text
192303.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192306(n/a)See Bill Text
192306.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2013
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2013+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2013S1+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2013F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2013F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2013FS1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2013FS1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0801V0166+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H08V0131+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1625+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S03V0264+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S05V0460+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB2013+HB2013
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0795HB2013+HB2013

Bill Comments

feedback