VA HB2010 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Lottery; repeal prohibition against sale of lottery tickets over Internet. Repeals the prohibition against the sale of lottery tickets over the Internet.
Title
Virginia Lottery; regulations of sale of lottery tickets over Internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103935D |
Subjects
Computer Services and Uses
Gambling Lotteries Etc.
Internet
Lotteries Lottery Laws and Commissions
Taxation
Gambling Lotteries Etc.
Internet
Lotteries Lottery Laws and Commissions
Taxation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 4007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 4007.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2010 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2010+hil |