VA HB2010 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Motorcyclists. Allows motorcyclists who are 21 years old or older to ride without wearing helmets.
Title
Motorcycles; motorcyclists who are 21 years old or older to ride without wearing helmets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2013-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #2 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103488D |