VA HB201 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral services; handling of human remains. Provides that, upon taking custody of a dead human body, a funeral service establishment shall maintain the body in a manner that provides complete coverage and is resistant to leakage or spillage. If the body is to be stored for more than 48 hours prior to disposition, the establishment shall maintain the body in refrigeration or, with the express permission of the next of kin, have the body embalmed and, if the body is to be stored for more than 10 days at a location other than the establishment, disclose the location where the body is to be stored and the method of storage.
Title
Human remains; proper handling by funeral establishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0823) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 823 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB201ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB201ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-10 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105840D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB201S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105840D-S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105840D-S1 | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Rereferred to Education and Health | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB201H2 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Substitute by Delegate Alexander agreed to 10104999D-H2 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Floor substitute printed 10104999D-H2 (Alexander) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Committee substitute rejected 10104103D-H1 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (20-Y 2-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104103D-H1 | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2010-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2010-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103141D |