VA HB2008 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Health; study of tick-borne diseases in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Department of Health to convene a work group to study and make recommendations for reducing the occurrence and impact of tick-borne diseases in the Commonwealth. The work group shall report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tick-borne diseases; VDH to study reducing occurrence & impact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
2023-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2008ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21SenateRead third time
2023-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17SenateReported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
2023-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2023-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-06HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2023-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2023-02-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-02-02HouseRead first time
2023-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101717D

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2008
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2008+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2008ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0120+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2008F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2008FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H1202V0036+HB2008
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H12V0069+HB2008
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1416+HB2008
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S10V0099+HB2008
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0630HB2008+HB2008
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0679HB2008+HB2008

Bill Comments

feedback