VA HB2008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2008
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder. Requires that any provider contract between a carrier and a participating health care provider with prescriptive authority, or its contracting agent, contain provisions that require, when a carrier has previously approved prior authorization for any drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder listed in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association, no additional prior authorization can be required if (i) the drug is a covered benefit, (ii) the prescription does not exceed the U.S. Food and Drug Administration-labeled dosages, (iii) the prescription has been continuously issued for no fewer than three months, and (iv) the prescriber performs an annual review of the patient to evaluate the drug's continued efficacy, changes in the patient's health status, and potential contraindications. The bill provides that this requirement does not prohibit a carrier from requiring prior authorization for any drug that is not listed on its prescription drug formulary at the time the initial prescription is issued. The bill also provides that such provider contracts contain provisions requiring a carrier to honor a prior authorization issued by the carrier for a drug regardless if the drug is removed from the carrier's prescription drug formulary after the initial prescription for that drug is issued. Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder. Requires that any provider contract between a carrier and a participating health care provider with prescriptive authority, or its contracting agent, contain provisions that require, when a carrier has previously approved prior authorization for any drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder listed in the most recent edition of the Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders published by the American Psychiatric Association, no additional prior authorization can be required if (i) the drug is a covered benefit, (ii) the prescription does not exceed the U.S. Food and Drug Administration-labeled dosages, (iii) the prescription has been continuously issued for no fewer than three months, and (iv) the prescriber performs an annual review of the patient to evaluate the drug's continued efficacy, changes in the patient's health status, and potential contraindications. The bill provides that this requirement does not prohibit a carrier from requiring prior authorization for any drug that is not listed on its prescription drug formulary at the time the initial prescription is issued. The bill also provides that such provider contracts contain provisions requiring a carrier to honor a prior authorization issued by the carrier for a drug regardless if the drug is removed from the carrier's prescription drug formulary after the initial prescription for that drug is issued.
Title
Health insurance; authorization of drug prescribed for the treatment of a mental disorder.
Sponsors
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2008H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103490D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103490D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101077D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2008 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)