VA HB2008 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Education; energy career cluster. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with representatives from pertinent industries such as renewable energy, natural gas, nuclear energy, coal, and oil, to establish an energy career cluster. The bill requires the Department of Education to base the knowledge and skill sets contained in such energy career cluster on the energy industry competency and credential models developed by the Center for Energy Workforce Development in partnership with the U.S. Department of Labor. The bill further requires the Department of Education to report to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health no later than December 1, 2019, on its progress toward establishing such energy career cluster. This bill is identical to SB 1348.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy career cluster; Department of Education, et al., to establish, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2008ER)
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103837D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2008
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2008+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2008ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0370+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0012+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0056+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0203V0018+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0050+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2359+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0232+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2008+HB2008
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2008+HB2008

Bill Comments

feedback