VA HB2007 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prescription drug price transparency. Directs the Department of Health to enter into a contract or an agreement with a nonprofit data services organization to collect, compile, and make available on its website information about prescription drug pricing and requires every health carrier, pharmacy benefits manager, and drug manufacturer to report information about prescription drug prices to the nonprofit data services organization with which the Department of Health has entered into a contract for such purpose. The bill provides that in any case in which the Department determines that the data reported by health carriers, pharmacy benefit managers, and drug manufacturers is insufficient, the Department may require wholesale distributors to report certain data about prescription drug costs. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022. Prescription drug price transparency. Directs the Department of Health to enter into a contract or an agreement with a nonprofit data services organization to collect, compile, and make available on its website information about prescription drug pricing and requires every health carrier, pharmacy benefits manager, and drug manufacturer to report information about prescription drug prices to the nonprofit data services organization with which the Department of Health has entered into a contract for such purpose. The bill provides that in any case in which the Department determines that the data reported by health carriers, pharmacy benefit managers, and drug manufacturers is insufficient, the Department may require wholesale distributors to report certain data about prescription drug costs. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription drugs; price transparency, definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21103917D-EH1
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2007EH1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
2021-02-02HouseCommittee on Health, Welfare and Institutions substitute agreed to 21103917D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103917D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-23HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100752D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32123.3(n/a)See Bill Text
3823407.15:6(n/a)See Bill Text
3823407.22(n/a)See Bill Text
5413436.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.02(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2007
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2007+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2007H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2007EH1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2007AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103225D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103917D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2007F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2007FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2007FEH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1201V0011+HB2007
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0083+HB2007
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0205V0017+HB2007
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0087+HB2007
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1387+HB2007
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0103+HB2007

Bill Comments 750

feedback