VA HB2006 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2006
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Tax exemptions for energy storage systems. Declares that energy storage systems are included in the definition of certified pollution control equipment and facilities, making energy storage systems exempt from state and local taxation. The bill defines "energy storage system" as equipment, facilities, or devices that are capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and redelivering that energy after it has been stored. The tax exemption applies only to certain projects with alternating current (AC) storage capacity of more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts. Tax exemptions for energy storage systems. Declares that energy storage systems are included in the definition of certified pollution control equipment and facilities, making energy storage systems exempt from state and local taxation. The bill defines "energy storage system" as equipment, facilities, or devices that are capable of absorbing energy, storing it for a period of time, and redelivering that energy after it has been stored. The tax exemption applies only to certain projects with alternating current (AC) storage capacity of more than five megawatts and less than 150 megawatts. The bill also allows localities to assess a revenue share of up to $1400 per megawatt on energy storage systems. The bill provides that on July 1, 2026, and every five years thereafter, the maximum amount of the revenue share that a locality may impose on energy storage systems as well as certain solar energy projects shall be increased by 10 percent. No increase may be made to any revenue share imposed by a locality on a solar energy project or energy storage systems for which an application has been filed with the locality and such application has been approved prior to January 1, 2021. The bill defines energy storage systems as electric suppliers whose property shall be assessed by the State Corporation Commission.
Title
Energy storage systems; definitions, tax exemption, revenue share for systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 0 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2006H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103350D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103350D-H1 |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101104D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2006 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 2636 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3660.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 609.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |