VA HB2005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF); eligibility. Makes eligible for TANF any person who is between the ages of 18 and 19 years old and a full-time student in a secondary school or in the equivalent level of career and technical education. Under current law, such persons are eligible for TANF if regularly attending, and expected to graduate from prior to turning 19 years of age, a secondary school or the equivalent level of career and technical education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF); eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 376 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2005ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 7-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 7-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101798D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
632602(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2005
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2005+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2005ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0376+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0007+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0022+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0205V0011+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0030+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2435+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0107+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0382+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2005+HB2005
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2005+HB2005

Bill Comments

feedback