VA HB2004 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Community health workers; certification. Requires the Department of Health to approve one or more entities to certify community health workers in the Commonwealth and prohibits a person from using or assuming the title of certified community health worker unless he is certified by an entity approved by the Department.
Title
Community health worker; VDH to approve one or more entities to certify workers in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105577D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103087D |