VA HB2004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Governing board of public institutions of higher education; annual executive summary; enrollment and financial assistance data for certain students. Requires the annual executive summary submitted by the governing board of each public institution of higher education to the General Assembly and the Governor to indicate the number of undergraduate students enrolled full time who are not citizens of the United States and the number of such students who receive annual financial assistance to attend such institution in an amount greater than 25 percent of the total annual cost of full-time undergraduate Virginia student tuition and room and board.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; annual executive summary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Stricken from docket by Education by voice vote |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102646D |
Subjects
Education
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Higher Education
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Students
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2004 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2004+hil |