VA HB2003 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices; certain advertising related to school quality. Adds as a prohibited practice under the Consumer Protection Act the use in any advertising any information regarding the quality of any public or private elementary or secondary school other than information derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or information derived from the school's website or the website of the school's district, unless such advertising contains a statement, displayed on its face in a conspicuous manner, that such school quality information is not derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or endorsed by the Department of Education. The bill provides that such provisions shall not become effective unless reenacted by the 2022 Session of the General Assembly. Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices; certain advertising related to school quality. Adds as a prohibited practice under the Consumer Protection Act the use in any advertising any information regarding the quality of any public or private elementary or secondary school other than information derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or information derived from the school's website or the website of the school's district, unless such advertising contains a statement, displayed on its face in a conspicuous manner, that such school quality information is not derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or endorsed by the Department of Education. The bill provides that such provisions shall not become effective unless reenacted by the 2022 Session of the General Assembly. The bill requires the Department of Law's Division of Consumer Counsel (the Division), to make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly for any legislation that the Division deems necessary to prevent the misleading or deceiving of consumers by the use of information in advertising regarding the quality of any public or private elementary or secondary school other than information derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or information derived from the school's website or the website of the school's district. The bill requires the Division to make its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices, certain advertising related to school quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 54-N) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB2003H2
2021-02-04HouseSubstitute by Delegate Samirah agreed to 21104435D-H2
2021-02-04HouseCommittee on Labor and Commerce substitute rejected 21103772D-H1
2021-02-04HouseFloor substitute printed 21104435D-H2 (Samirah)
2021-02-04HousePassed by temporarily
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute reconsidered 21103772D-H1
2021-02-03HouseMotion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to
2021-02-03HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-03HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2021-02-02HousePassed by for the day
2021-02-02HouseReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 54-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead third time and defeated by House (44-Y 54-N)
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2003H1
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103772D-H1
2021-02-01HouseRead second time
2021-01-29HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103772D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102731D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
591200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2003
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2003+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2003H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2003H2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103772D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103772.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2003F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2003FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1401V0015+HB2003
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1401V0025+HB2003
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H14V0082+HB2003
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1333+HB2003
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1479+HB2003
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0133+HB2003

Bill Comments 750

feedback