VA HB2003 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2003
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices; certain advertising related to school quality. Adds as a prohibited practice under the Consumer Protection Act the use in any advertising any information regarding the quality of any public or private elementary or secondary school other than information derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or information derived from the school's website or the website of the school's district, unless such advertising contains a statement, displayed on its face in a conspicuous manner, that such school quality information is not derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or endorsed by the Department of Education. The bill provides that such provisions shall not become effective unless reenacted by the 2022 Session of the General Assembly. Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices; certain advertising related to school quality. Adds as a prohibited practice under the Consumer Protection Act the use in any advertising any information regarding the quality of any public or private elementary or secondary school other than information derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or information derived from the school's website or the website of the school's district, unless such advertising contains a statement, displayed on its face in a conspicuous manner, that such school quality information is not derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or endorsed by the Department of Education. The bill provides that such provisions shall not become effective unless reenacted by the 2022 Session of the General Assembly. The bill requires the Department of Law's Division of Consumer Counsel (the Division), to make recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly for any legislation that the Division deems necessary to prevent the misleading or deceiving of consumers by the use of information in advertising regarding the quality of any public or private elementary or secondary school other than information derived from the school quality indicators contained in the School Quality Profiles established by the Department of Education or information derived from the school's website or the website of the school's district. The bill requires the Division to make its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2021.
Title
Consumer Protection Act; prohibited practices, certain advertising related to school quality.
Sponsors
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 54-N) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 54-N) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB2003H2 |
2021-02-04 | House | Substitute by Delegate Samirah agreed to 21104435D-H2 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee on Labor and Commerce substitute rejected 21103772D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Floor substitute printed 21104435D-H2 (Samirah) |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute reconsidered 21103772D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Motion to reconsider pass by for the day agreed to |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2021-02-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-02-02 | House | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by House |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: DEFEATED (44-Y 54-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and defeated by House (44-Y 54-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2003H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103772D-H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103772D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102731D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2003 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)