VA HB2003 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Major business facility job tax credit; extension; access to information. Extends the sunset date of the major business facility job tax credit from January 1, 2020, to July 1, 2022. The bill also requires the Department of Taxation, for taxable years beginning on and after January 1, 2019, to publish the following information about companies that are using the credit: (i) locations of sites used for major business facilities for which a credit was claimed, (ii) North American Industry Classification System codes used for the major business facilities for which a credit was claimed, (iii) number of qualified full time employees for whom a credit was claimed, and (iv) total cost to the Commonwealth's general fund of the credits claimed.
Title
Major business facility job tax credit; extends sunset date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 699 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2003ER) |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106447D-S1 (89-Y 8-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2003S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106447D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106447D-S1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102073D-E |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2003E |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102073D |