VA HB1999 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Tax Commissioner; waiver of accrual of interest in the event that the Governor declares a state of emergency. Authorizes the Tax Commissioner to waive interest for any class of taxpayers when he finds that imposing interest has caused, or would cause, undue hardship to such class of taxpayers because of a natural disaster or other reason. The bill allows the Tax Commissioner to grant such waiver only if the Governor declares a state of emergency in the Commonwealth with respect to such natural disaster or other reason. Tax Commissioner; waiver of accrual of interest in the event that the Governor declares a state of emergency. Authorizes the Tax Commissioner to waive interest for any class of taxpayers when he finds that imposing interest has caused, or would cause, undue hardship to such class of taxpayers because of a natural disaster or other reason. The bill allows the Tax Commissioner to grant such waiver only if the Governor declares a state of emergency in the Commonwealth with respect to such natural disaster or other reason.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Commissioner; waiver of accrual of interest in the event that Gov. declares state of emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2021-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102162D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581112(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback