VA HB1998 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Native plant species; state agencies. Directs the Secretaries of Natural and Historic Resources, Agriculture and Forestry, and Administration to coordinate the development of strategic actions for state agencies to take to prioritize the use of native plant species on state properties. Native plant species; state agencies. Directs the Secretaries of Natural and Historic Resources, Agriculture and Forestry, and Administration to coordinate the development of strategic actions for state agencies to take to prioritize the use of native plant species on state properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native plant species; state agencies to prioritize use on state properties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0193)
2023-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 193 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24SenateSigned by President
2023-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1998ER)
2023-02-22HouseEnrolled
2023-02-17SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17SenateRead third time
2023-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2023-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N)
2023-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
2023-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 23100246D-E
2023-02-06HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1998E
2023-02-06HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-02-06HouseRead second time
2023-02-05HouseRead first time
2023-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2023-02-01HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N)
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2023-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N)
2023-01-20HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100246D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22220.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1998
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1998+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1998E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1998ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0193+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/23105514A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1998AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1998F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1998FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1998FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H0101V0009+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H01V0050+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H02V0093+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1624+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S01V0089+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0538HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0551HB1998+HB1998

Bill Comments

feedback