VA HB1998 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Secure Commonwealth Panel; membership and duties. Revises the membership of the Secure Commonwealth Panel, renamed the Secure and Resilient Commonwealth Panel, and requires the Panel to create an Emergency Management Awareness Group consisting of the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security, the Lieutenant Governor, the Attorney General, the Executive Secretary of the Supreme Court of Virginia, and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology. The bill requires the Group to meet during a state of emergency to review critical information concerning such situation to facilitate communication between the executive, legislative, and judicial branches of state government. The bill dissolves the Virginia Emergency Response Council and transfers its duties to the Panel. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure and Resilient Commonwealth Panel; revises membership and duties, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0512)
2017-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 512 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1998ER)
2017-02-23HouseEnrolled
2017-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-16SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-16SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-01HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31HousePrinted as engrossed 17104839D-EH1
2017-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1998EH1
2017-01-31HouseAmendments by Delegate Lingamfelter agreed to
2017-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104839D-H1
2017-01-31HouseRead second time
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104839D-H1
2017-01-27HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #2
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102169D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22222.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1998
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1998+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1998H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1998EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1998ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0512+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H15V0028+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1769+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0147+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0597HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0598HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0599HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2494+HB1998

Bill Comments 750

feedback