VA HB1998 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System work group to develop recommendations to encourage and facilitate saving for retirement. Requires the Virginia Retirement System (VRS) to convene a work group to review current state and federal programs that encourage citizens of the Commonwealth to save for retirement by participating in retirement savings plans. The review will include an examination of retirement savings options for self-employed individuals, part-time employees, full-time employees whose employers do not offer a retirement savings plan, and groups with a low savings rate. The work group will include representatives of VRS, the Department of Taxation, small business, the self-employed, the Virginia College Savings Plan, and other stakeholders. The bill requires VRS to report its findings, which may include recommendations for statutory changes or amendments to the general appropriation act, to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and federal programs; VRS shall convene a work group to review, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0669)
2015-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 669 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1998ER)
2015-03-06HouseEnrolled
2015-02-24SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2015-02-24SenateRead third time
2015-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2015-02-20SenateReported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
2015-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2015-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-10HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1998H1
2015-02-09HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15104874D-H1
2015-02-09HouseRead second time
2015-02-07HouseRead first time
2015-02-06HouseCommittee substitute printed 15104874D-H1
2015-02-06HouseReported from Rules with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2015-02-05HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
2015-01-27HouseAssigned Rules sub: Studies
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100635D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1998
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1998+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1998H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1998ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0669+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H2003V0044+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H20V0070+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2081+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S10V0129+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0736HB1998+HB1998
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0789HB1998+HB1998

Bill Comments 750

feedback