VA HB1998 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Food stamps program. Updates obsolete references to Food Stamps program and requires the State Board of Social Services to establish broad-based categorical eligibility for supplemental nutrition assistance under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food stamps; updates obsolete references to program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-05HouseLeft in Health, Welfare and Institutions
2013-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote
2013-01-23HouseAssigned HWI sub: #1
2013-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2013-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102361D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222670(n/a)See Bill Text
224025(n/a)See Bill Text
242411.2(n/a)See Bill Text
515134(n/a)See Bill Text
5813833(n/a)See Bill Text
5813840(n/a)See Bill Text
581609.10(n/a)See Bill Text
581611.1(n/a)See Bill Text
602608.2(n/a)See Bill Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
632505(n/a)See Bill Text
632505.1(n/a)See Bill Text
632505.2(n/a)See Bill Text
632517(n/a)See Bill Text
632523(n/a)See Bill Text
632524(n/a)See Bill Text
632526(n/a)See Bill Text
632527(n/a)See Bill Text
632608(n/a)See Bill Text
632616(n/a)See Bill Text
632801(n/a)See Bill Text
652101(n/a)See Bill Text
652500(n/a)See Bill Text
652502(n/a)See Bill Text
652512(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback