VA HB1998 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Northern Virginia Transportation District; long-range planning. Establishes responsibilities for various entities for long-range transportation planning for the Virginia Department of Transportation in the Northern Virginia Transportation District.
Title
Northern Virginia Transportation District; long-range transportation planning.
Sponsors
Del. David Albo [R] | Del. Barbara Comstock [R] | Del. Thomas Greason [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] | Del. Glenn Oder [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (85-Y 13-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House (85-Y 13-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103501D-E | |
2011-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1998E | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (18-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103501D |