VA HB1994 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Small agricultural generators; definition. Expands the definition of small agricultural generator to include any business operating a small agricultural generating facility that has been granted a manufacturer license as a distillery, limited distillery, brewery, limited brewery, winery, or farm winery. Under current law, small agricultural generators include only those businesses operating a small agricultural generating facility as part of an agricultural business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small agricultural generators; expands definition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 6-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
2021-01-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1994H1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103203D-H1
2021-01-20HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseIncorporates HB2215 (Runion)
2021-01-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103203D-H1
2021-01-19HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100994D

Same As/Similar To

HB2215 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Left in Labor and Commerce

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback