VA HB1993 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Duties of agencies and their appointing authorities; diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans. Requires state agencies to establish and maintain a comprehensive diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plan in coordination with the Governor's Director of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State agencies and their appointing authorities; diversity, equity, and inclusion strategic plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102795D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22602(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback