VA HB1993 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Recounts; special election to be held in the case of a tie vote. Provides that if, after a recount of an election, the recount court finds that each party to the recount has received an equal number of votes, there shall be a special election to determine which candidate is elected to the office. This provision would not apply in cases of recounts of elections for Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or Attorney General; the Constitution of Virginia sets out the process for determining a winner in the case of tie votes for statewide offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recounts; special election to be held in the case of a tie vote.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101998D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242802(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback