VA HB1992 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Purchase, possession, or transportation of firearms following conviction for assault and battery of a family or household member; penalties. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of assault and battery of a family or household member, as defined in the bill, from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm. A person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. Purchase, possession, or transportation of firearms following conviction for assault and battery of a family or household member; penalties. Prohibits a person who has been convicted of assault and battery of a family or household member, as defined in the bill, from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm. A person who violates this provision is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms; purchase, etc., following conviction for assault and battery of a family member.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N) (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (10-Y 9-N) (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Passage (54-Y 46-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (54-Y 46-N)
2021-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1992H2
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103901D-H2
2021-01-29HouseRead second time
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103901D-H2
2021-01-27HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-26HouseMotion to refer to committee agreed to
2021-01-26HouseFloor substitute printed 21103651D-H1 (Murphy)
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseReported from Public Safety (10-Y 9-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned PS sub: Firearms
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100815D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.09(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.1:8(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:2(n/a)See Bill Text
182308.2:3(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.28(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1992
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1992+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1992H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1992H2+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1992F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1992F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1992FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1992FH2160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1992FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1992FH2122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1501V0001+HB1992
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H15V0007+HB1992
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0123+HB1992
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1301+HB1992
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0128+HB1992

Bill Comments

feedback