VA HB1992 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; absentee voting; no-excuse, in-person. Allows qualified voters to vote absentee in person without providing an excuse for not being able to vote in person on election day. The bill retains the statutory list of specific reasons allowing a voter to cast an absentee ballot by mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; absentee voting; no-excuse, in-person.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-10HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2015-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2015-01-20HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2015-01-14HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102436D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242700(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback