VA HB1991 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; concurrent jurisdiction; suits for divorce. Specifies that, when a suit for divorce has been filed in a circuit court in which the custody, guardianship, visitation, or support of children of the parties or spousal support is raised by the pleadings and a hearing, including a pendente lite hearing, is set by the circuit court on any such issue for a date certain or placed on a motions docket within 21 days of the filing, though such hearing itself may occur after such 21-day period, the juvenile and domestic relations district courts shall be divested of the right to enter any further decrees or orders to determine custody, guardianship, visitation, or support when raised for such hearing, and such matters shall be determined by the circuit court unless both parties agreed to a referral to the juvenile court.
Title
Juvenile and domestic relations district courts; concurrent jurisdiction, suits for divorce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1991ER) |
2023-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2023-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-23 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100639D |