VA HB1989 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Public health emergency; emergency medical services agencies; real-time access to information. Directs the Department of Health to develop and implement a system for sharing information regarding confirmed cases of communicable diseases of public health threat with emergency medical services agencies in real time during a declared public health emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat and with the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board and regional emergency medical services councils upon request, in order to protect the health and safety of emergency medical services personnel and the public. Public health emergency; emergency medical services agencies; real-time access to information. Directs the Department of Health to develop and implement a system for sharing information regarding confirmed cases of communicable diseases of public health threat with emergency medical services agencies in real time during a declared public health emergency related to a communicable disease of public health threat and with the Emergency Medical Services Advisory Board and regional emergency medical services councils upon request, in order to protect the health and safety of emergency medical services personnel and the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health emergency; emergency medical services agencies, real-time access to information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21102516D-E
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1989E
2021-02-02HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102516D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32148.001(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1989
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1989+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1989E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1989AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103271A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1989F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1989FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1201V0003+HB1989
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0050+HB1989
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0205V0015+HB1989
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0086+HB1989
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1354+HB1989
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1416+HB1989
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0102+HB1989

Bill Comments 750

feedback