VA HB1988 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1988
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Pharmacy; pharmaceutical processors; processing and dispensing cannabis oil. Effects numerous changes to the processing and dispensing of cannabis oil by pharmaceutical processors in the Commonwealth. The bill defines the term "designated caregiver facility" and allows any staff member or employee of a designated caregiver facility to assist with the possession, acquisition, delivery, transfer, transportation, and administration of cannabis oil for any patients residing in the designated caregiver facility. The bill allows written certifications for use of cannabis oil to include an authentic electronic practitioner signature. The bill also eliminates the requirement that a pharmacist have oversight of the cultivation and processing areas of a pharmaceutical processor, instead requiring pharmaceutical processors to designate a person to oversee cultivation and production areas; removes the requirement that a cannabis dispensing facility undergo quarterly inspections, instead requiring that inspections occur no more than once annually; and allows pharmaceutical processors to remediate cannabis oil that fails any quality testing standard. The bill requires pharmaceutical processors to maintain evidence of criminal background checks for all employees and delivery agents of the pharmaceutical processor. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations implementing the provisions of the bill and regulations creating reasonable restrictions on advertising and promotion by pharmaceutical processors by September 1, 2021. Board of Pharmacy; pharmaceutical processors; processing and dispensing cannabis oil. Effects numerous changes to the processing and dispensing of cannabis oil by pharmaceutical processors in the Commonwealth. The bill defines the term "designated caregiver facility" and allows any staff member or employee of a designated caregiver facility to assist with the possession, acquisition, delivery, transfer, transportation, and administration of cannabis oil for any patients residing in the designated caregiver facility. The bill allows written certifications for use of cannabis oil to include an authentic electronic practitioner signature. The bill also eliminates the requirement that a pharmacist have oversight of the cultivation and processing areas of a pharmaceutical processor, instead requiring pharmaceutical processors to designate a person to oversee cultivation and production areas; removes the requirement that a cannabis dispensing facility undergo quarterly inspections, instead requiring that inspections occur no more than once annually; and allows pharmaceutical processors to remediate cannabis oil that fails any quality testing standard. The bill requires pharmaceutical processors to maintain evidence of criminal background checks for all employees and delivery agents of the pharmaceutical processor. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations implementing the provisions of the bill and regulations creating reasonable restrictions on advertising and promotion by pharmaceutical processors by September 1, 2021.
Title
Cannabis oil; processing and dispensing by pharmaceutical processors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 205 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1988ER) |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-23 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200148D-S1 (94-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1988S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200148D-S1 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200148D-S1 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1988H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103668D-H1 |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103668D-H1 |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101833D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1988 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3408.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3442.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |