VA HB1988 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Pharmacy; pharmaceutical processors; processing and dispensing cannabis oil; report. Effects numerous changes to the processing and dispensing of cannabis oil by pharmaceutical processors in the Commonwealth. The bill allows written certifications for use of cannabis oil to include an electronic practitioner signature. The bill also eliminates the requirement that a pharmacist have oversight of the cultivation and processing areas of a pharmaceutical processor, instead requiring pharmaceutical processors to designate a person to oversee cultivation and production areas; removes the requirement that a cannabis dispensing facility undergo quarterly inspections, instead requiring that inspections occur no more than once annually; and allows pharmaceutical processors to remediate cannabis oil that fails any quality testing standard. The bill requires pharmaceutical processors to maintain evidence of criminal background checks for all employees and delivery agents of the pharmaceutical processor. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations implementing the provisions of the bill and regulations creating reasonable restrictions on advertising and promotion by pharmaceutical processors by July 1, 2021, and directs the Board of Pharmacy to solicit input from stakeholders and appropriate agencies of the Commonwealth in order to develop recommendations for legislative action to permit the acceptance of cannabis products by hospices and hospice facilities in the Commonwealth and report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by October 1, 2021. Board of Pharmacy; pharmaceutical processors; processing and dispensing cannabis oil; report. Effects numerous changes to the processing and dispensing of cannabis oil by pharmaceutical processors in the Commonwealth. The bill allows written certifications for use of cannabis oil to include an electronic practitioner signature. The bill also eliminates the requirement that a pharmacist have oversight of the cultivation and processing areas of a pharmaceutical processor, instead requiring pharmaceutical processors to designate a person to oversee cultivation and production areas; removes the requirement that a cannabis dispensing facility undergo quarterly inspections, instead requiring that inspections occur no more than once annually; and allows pharmaceutical processors to remediate cannabis oil that fails any quality testing standard. The bill requires pharmaceutical processors to maintain evidence of criminal background checks for all employees and delivery agents of the pharmaceutical processor. The bill directs the Board of Pharmacy to promulgate regulations implementing the provisions of the bill and regulations creating reasonable restrictions on advertising and promotion by pharmaceutical processors by July 1, 2021, and directs the Board of Pharmacy to solicit input from stakeholders and appropriate agencies of the Commonwealth in order to develop recommendations for legislative action to permit the acceptance of cannabis products by hospices and hospice facilities in the Commonwealth and report its findings and recommendations to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions and the Senate Committee on Education and Health by October 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis oil; processing and dispensing by pharmaceutical processors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1988H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103668D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103668D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health Professions
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101833D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413408.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.6(n/a)See Bill Text
5413442.7(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1988
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1988+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1988H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103668D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103668.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103981A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1988F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1988FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1202V0007+HB1988
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0089+HB1988
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1353+HB1988
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1415+HB1988
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0106+HB1988

Bill Comments 750

feedback