VA HB1988 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Military retirement benefits; marital share. Requires that the determination of military retirement benefits in a divorce be made in accordance with the federal Uniformed Services Former Spouses' Protection Act (10 U.S.C. 1408 et seq.).
Title
Military retirement benefits; marital share.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0304) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 304 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1988ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (12-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102650D |