VA HB1987 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Financial exploitation of aged or incapacitated adults; authority to refuse transactions or disbursements. Authorizes financial institution staff to refuse to execute a transaction, to delay a transaction, or to refuse to disburse funds, regardless of whether such staff has reported suspected financial exploitation, if the financial institution staff (i) believes in good faith that the transaction or disbursement may involve, facilitate, result in, or contribute to the financial exploitation of an aged or incapacitated adult or (ii) makes, or has actual knowledge that another person has made, a report to the local department of social services or adult protective services hotline stating a good faith belief that the transaction or disbursement may involve, facilitate, result in, or contribute to the financial exploitation of an aged or incapacitated adult. The measure authorizes financial institution staff to continue to refuse to execute a transaction, delay a transaction, or refuse to disburse funds for not more than 30 business days after the date such transaction or disbursement was initially requested on the basis of such a good faith belief, unless otherwise ordered by a court. The measure authorizes such staff, to the extent permitted by law, to report any information or records relevant to an investigation. A financial institution and its staff are immune from civil or criminal liability, absent gross negligence or willful misconduct, for refusing to execute a transaction, delaying a transaction, or refusing to disburse funds pursuant to this measure. This bill is identical to SB 1490.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aged or incapacitated adults; financial exploitation, authority to refuse transactions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0420)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 420 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1987ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference substitute printed 19107620D-H2
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenateSenators: Obenshain, McDougle, Spruill
2019-02-22SenateConferees reappointed by Senate
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, McDougle, Spruill
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Toscano, Ware, Hugo
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106848D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1987S1
2019-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106848D-S1
2019-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106848D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-11SenateRereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-23HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1987H1
2019-01-22HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104608D-H1
2019-01-22HouseRead second time
2019-01-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-17HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104608D-H1
2019-01-17HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102607D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321606(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1987
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1987+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1987H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1987S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1987H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1987ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0420+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1402V0001+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0014+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1789+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0145+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0108+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB1987+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB1987+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3166+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0923HB1987+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1056HB1987+HB1987
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3317+HB1987

Bill Comments

feedback