VA HB1985 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Pet shops; sale of dogs or cats. Codifies regulations proposed by the Virginia Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services governing the keeping of dogs and cats by pet shops, defined in the bill. The bill requires such pet shops to register and pay a $250 annual registration fee to the Department. The bill requires pet shops in existence on July 1, 2023, to register with the Department by January 1, 2024. The bill prohibits pet shops from offering dogs or cats for sale to research facilities and establishes certain standards of care for the keeping of dogs or cats. The bill directs the State Animal Welfare Inspector to conduct at least one unannounced, annual inspection of each pet shop and provides certain standards for the Inspector and pet shop owner in order to address any violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pet shops; sale of dogs or cats.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-13HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103333D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
326511.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback