VA HB1985 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19. Establishes a presumption that COVID-19 causing the death or disability of health care providers is an occupational disease compensable under the Workers' Compensation Act. The bill provides that the COVID-19 virus is established by a positive diagnostic test for COVID-19, an incubation period consistent with COVID-19, and signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that require medical treatment. The bill provides that such presumption applies to any death or disability occurring on or after March 12, 2020, caused by infection from the COVID-19 virus, provided that for any such death or disability that occurred on or after March 12, 2020, and prior to December 31, 2021, the claimant received a positive diagnosis of COVID-19 from a licensed physician, after either a presumptive positive test or a laboratory-confirmed test for COVID-19, and presented with signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that required medical treatment. The bill provides that such presumptions do not apply to any person offered by his employer a vaccine for the prevention of COVID-19 unless the person's physician determines in writing that immunization would pose a significant risk to the person's health. Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19. Establishes a presumption that COVID-19 causing the death or disability of health care providers is an occupational disease compensable under the Workers' Compensation Act. The bill provides that the COVID-19 virus is established by a positive diagnostic test for COVID-19, an incubation period consistent with COVID-19, and signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that require medical treatment. The bill provides that such presumption applies to any death or disability occurring on or after March 12, 2020, caused by infection from the COVID-19 virus, provided that for any such death or disability that occurred on or after March 12, 2020, and prior to December 31, 2021, the claimant received a positive diagnosis of COVID-19 from a licensed physician, after either a presumptive positive test or a laboratory-confirmed test for COVID-19, and presented with signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that required medical treatment. The bill provides that such presumptions do not apply to any person offered by his employer a vaccine for the prevention of COVID-19 unless the person's physician determines in writing that immunization would pose a significant risk to the person's health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21103301D-EH1
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1985EH1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee on Appropriations amendments agreed to
2021-02-02HouseCommittee on Labor and Commerce substitute agreed to 21103301D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103301D-H1
2021-01-21HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101723D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1985
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1985+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1985H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1985EH1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1985AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103301D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1985FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1985FEH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1401V0001+HB1985
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H14V0049+HB1985
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0202V0010+HB1985
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0080+HB1985
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1385+HB1985
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S02V0070+HB1985

Bill Comments

feedback