VA HB1985 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Underinsured motorist insurance coverage. Provides that a liability insurer's written offer to pay the limits of its policy may be made contingent upon waiver of subrogation. These provisions clarify legislation enacted in the 2010 Session that permits a liability insurer to be relieved of the costs of defending the owner or operator in a claim to the extent the costs are incurred after the liability insurer makes an irrevocable written offer to pay the limits of its policy. This measure further states that these provisions, including the liability insurer's irrevocable offer and the underinsured insurer's liability for defense costs, do not apply if a jury verdict is returned for an amount equal to or less than the total liability coverage available for payment or a ruling dismissing the complaint, including the plaintiff's voluntary nonsuit.
Title
Underinsured motorist; insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0107) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 107 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-23 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-23 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1985ER) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1985H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104627D-H1 | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104627D-H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103602D |