VA HB1984 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1984
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; triennial review; rates of return. Provides that the State Corporation Commission, in any triennial review proceeding, including the first triennial review proceeding conducted after January 1, 2021, for Dominion Energy Virginia, may use any methodology it finds consistent with the public interest to determine fair rates of return on common equity for the utility's generation and distribution services. In any such triennial review, regardless of whether the utility earned above or below its authorized rate of return during the test period under review, the Commission also may order any increases or decreases to the utility's rates for generation and distribution that it deems necessary and appropriate, as long as the resulting rates provide the utility with the opportunity to (i) fully recover its costs of providing its services and (ii) earn an authorized rate of return.
Title
Electric utilities; triennial review proceeding by SCC, fair rates of return.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Commerce and Labor (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101313D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1984 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)