VA HB1982 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1982
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrient credits; use by facility with certain stormwater discharge permit. Authorizes a facility that has been issued a Virginia Pollution Discharge Elimination System (VPDES) permit regulating stormwater discharges to acquire, use, and transfer nutrient credits for compliance with any waste load allocation established as an effluent limitation in its VPDES permit. Current law allows only a facility registered under the Industrial Stormwater General Permit to use nutrient credits for such purpose. Nutrient credits; use by facility with certain stormwater discharge permit. Authorizes a facility that has been issued a Virginia Pollution Discharge Elimination System (VPDES) permit regulating stormwater discharges to acquire, use, and transfer nutrient credits for compliance with any waste load allocation established as an effluent limitation in its VPDES permit. Current law allows only a facility registered under the Industrial Stormwater General Permit to use nutrient credits for such purpose.
Title
Nutrient credits; use by facility with certain stormwater discharge permit.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0360) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 360 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1982ER) |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102682D-E |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1982E |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102682D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1982 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)