VA HB1982 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1982
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrient credits; use by facility with certain stormwater discharge permit. Authorizes a facility that has been issued a Virginia Pollution Discharge Elimination System (VPDES) permit regulating stormwater discharges to acquire, use, and transfer nutrient credits for compliance with any waste load allocation established as an effluent limitation in its VPDES permit. Current law allows only a facility registered under the Industrial Stormwater General Permit to use nutrient credits for such purpose. Nutrient credits; use by facility with certain stormwater discharge permit. Authorizes a facility that has been issued a Virginia Pollution Discharge Elimination System (VPDES) permit regulating stormwater discharges to acquire, use, and transfer nutrient credits for compliance with any waste load allocation established as an effluent limitation in its VPDES permit. Current law allows only a facility registered under the Industrial Stormwater General Permit to use nutrient credits for such purpose.
Title
Nutrient credits; use by facility with certain stormwater discharge permit.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102682D-E |
2021-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1982E |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102682D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1982 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)