VA HB1981 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; access to dwelling unit during certain declared states of emergency. Provides that a tenant shall be deemed to have reasonable justification for declining to permit a landlord or managing agent to exhibit the tenant's dwelling unit for sale or lease if the tenant has reasonable concern for his own health, or the health of any authorized occupant, during a state of emergency declared by the Governor in response to a communicable disease of public health threat and the tenant has provided written notice to the landlord informing the landlord of such concern. The bill requires the tenant in such circumstances to provide to the landlord or managing agent a video tour of the dwelling unit or other acceptable substitute for exhibiting the dwelling unit for sale or lease. The bill also provides that during a state of emergency declared by the Governor in response to a communicable disease of public health threat a tenant may provide written notice to the landlord requesting that one or more nonemergency property conditions in the dwelling unit not be addressed in the normal course of business of the landlord due to such communicable disease of public health threat. The bill provides that in such case, the tenant shall be deemed to have waived any and all claims and rights under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act against the landlord for failure to address such nonemergency property conditions. Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; access to dwelling unit during certain declared states of emergency. Provides that a tenant shall be deemed to have reasonable justification for declining to permit a landlord or managing agent to exhibit the tenant's dwelling unit for sale or lease if the tenant has reasonable concern for his own health, or the health of any authorized occupant, during a state of emergency declared by the Governor in response to a communicable disease of public health threat and the tenant has provided written notice to the landlord informing the landlord of such concern. The bill requires the tenant in such circumstances to provide to the landlord or managing agent a video tour of the dwelling unit or other acceptable substitute for exhibiting the dwelling unit for sale or lease. The bill also provides that during a state of emergency declared by the Governor in response to a communicable disease of public health threat a tenant may provide written notice to the landlord requesting that one or more nonemergency property conditions in the dwelling unit not be addressed in the normal course of business of the landlord due to such communicable disease of public health threat. The bill provides that in such case, the tenant shall be deemed to have waived any and all claims and rights under the Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act against the landlord for failure to address such nonemergency property conditions.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; access to dwelling unit during certain emergencies.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 21102398D-E |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1981E |
2021-01-29 | House | Emergency clause deleted |
2021-01-29 | House | Amendments by Delegate Simon agreed to |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102398D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1981 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)