VA HB1980 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dulles Greenway Authority created. Creates the Dulles Greenway Authority to, among other things, operate and maintain the Dulles Greenway. The Authority would be governed by a board of directors composed of 15 voting members as follows: one current member of the local governing body of each of the Counties of Arlington, Fairfax, Loudoun, and Prince William and the Cities of Alexandria, Fairfax, Falls Church, Manassas, and Manassas Park to be appointed by the Governor; four nonlegislative citizen members to be appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates; and two nonlegislative citizen members to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. The Secretary of Transportation would serve as a nonvoting ex officio member of the Board. For voting purposes, the members of the Board appointed by the Governor from the local governing bodies of the County of Fairfax and the County of Loudoun would each be entitled to cast two votes on each question put before the Board. The Authority would operate, maintain, and administer the Dulles Greenway on behalf of the Commonwealth using such moneys as provided to it for such purposes. The Authority would collect all tolls and other charges established by the Commonwealth Transportation Board for the use of the Dulles Greenway and would deposit such funds into the state treasury. The Authority would be prohibited from establishing or fixing tolls, rents, fees, or other charges for the use or enjoyment of any facility owned by the Commonwealth. The provisions of the bill would not become effective unless and until the Commonwealth Transportation Board acquires the Dulles Greenway on or before July 1, 2015.
Title
Dulles Greenway Authority; created.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2013-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100883D |
Subjects
Authorities
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Speaker of the House of Delegates
Washington, D.C. Metropolitan Area
Highways, Bridges, and Ferries
Speaker of the House of Delegates
Washington, D.C. Metropolitan Area