VA HB1979 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Electric vehicle rebate program; creation and funding; report. Creates a rebate program for the purchase or lease of new and used electric vehicles, to be administered by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy. A purchaser or lessee of a new or used electric vehicle would receive a $2,500 rebate at the time of purchase, and a purchaser or lessee with an annual household income that does not exceed 300 percent of the federal poverty level would be entitled to an additional $2,000 rebate for a new electric vehicle and $500 for a used electric vehicle beginning in taxable year 2022. The bill also establishes an Electric Vehicle Rebate Advisory Council to oversee the Electric Vehicle Rebate Program and to make recommendations regarding its implementation. The Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy is required to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding the Program. The program expires on January 1, 2027. Electric vehicle rebate program; creation and funding; report. Creates a rebate program for the purchase or lease of new and used electric vehicles, to be administered by the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy. A purchaser or lessee of a new or used electric vehicle would receive a $2,500 rebate at the time of purchase, and a purchaser or lessee with an annual household income that does not exceed 300 percent of the federal poverty level would be entitled to an additional $2,000 rebate for a new electric vehicle and $500 for a used electric vehicle beginning in taxable year 2022. The bill also establishes an Electric Vehicle Rebate Advisory Council to oversee the Electric Vehicle Rebate Program and to make recommendations regarding its implementation. The Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy is required to report annually to the Governor and the General Assembly regarding the Program. The program expires on January 1, 2027.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric vehicle rebate program; creation and funding, report, sunset date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1979H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104242D-H1
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseReported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-01HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104242D-H1
2021-02-01HouseReported from Finance with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 2-N)
2021-01-16HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102817D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221509.5(n/a)See Bill Text
5812626.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581433.1(n/a)See Bill Text
581439.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback