VA HB1979 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board for Contractors; exemption from licensure; responsibility for contracting with unlicensed or unregistered person. Exempts from licensure work undertaken by a person providing construction, remodeling, repair, improvement, removal, or demolition valued at $2,500 or less per project on behalf of a properly licensed contractor, provided that such contractor holds a valid license in the residential or commercial building contractor classification. The bill provides, however, that any construction services that require an individual license or certification shall be rendered only by an individual licensed or certified by the Board for Contractors. The bill also provides that any contractor that directly employs or otherwise contracts with a person who is not credentialed by the Board for Contractors for work requiring a credential shall be solely responsible for any monetary penalty or other sanction resulting from the act of employing or contracting with a person who lacks the proper credential based upon such person's failure to obtain or maintain the required credential. This bill is identical to SB 1193.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractors, Board for; exemptions, responsibility for contracting with unlicensed person.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
2017-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 132 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017
2017-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/15/17
2017-02-15SenateSigned by President
2017-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1979ER)
2017-02-14HouseEnrolled
2017-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-09SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-09SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-09SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-09SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-09SenateRead third time
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1979H1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104570D-H1
2017-01-27HouseRead second time
2017-01-26HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104570D-H1
2017-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103721D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5411100(n/a)See Bill Text
5411102(n/a)See Bill Text
5411103(n/a)See Bill Text
5411108.3(n/a)See Bill Text
5411109(n/a)See Bill Text
5411114(n/a)See Bill Text
5411115.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1979
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1979+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1979H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1979ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0132+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0011+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1104V0028+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0050+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1696+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0114+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0429HB1979+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0434HB1979+HB1979
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2261+HB1979

Bill Comments

feedback