VA HB1979 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Procedure upon arrest for certain drug offenses; Prescription Monitoring Program. Provides that when an officer arrests a person for a drug offense involving a controlled substance, where the dispensing of such substance is required to be reported to the Prescription Monitoring Program, the officer shall cause to be requested from the Program information regarding the identity of the prescriber, if available, unless the officer already knows the identity of the prescriber. The bill also provides that the officer shall cause the prescriber to be notified of the arrest, unless such notification would jeopardize an ongoing criminal investigation.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; procedure upon arrest for certain drug offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100669D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1979 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1979+hil |