VA HB1978 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1978
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-12 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative Staff Development Fund. Establishes the Legislative Staff Development Fund (Fund) to encourage and support the professional development of legislative staff. The bill defines "legislative staff" as salaried staff of a member of the House of Delegates, Senate of Virginia, or the Division of Legislative Services. The bill increases the annual lobbyist registration fee for for-profit entities from $100 to $400 and directs the $300 increase to be deposited into the Fund for the purposes described in the bill. Under the bill, any moneys remaining in the Fund at the end of each fiscal year that have not been expended for the purposes described in the bill shall revert to the general fund and be used exclusively to fund the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council. The bill has a delayed effective date of May 1, 2022. Legislative Staff Development Fund. Establishes the Legislative Staff Development Fund (Fund) to encourage and support the professional development of legislative staff. The bill defines "legislative staff" as salaried staff of a member of the House of Delegates, Senate of Virginia, or the Division of Legislative Services. The bill increases the annual lobbyist registration fee for for-profit entities from $100 to $400 and directs the $300 increase to be deposited into the Fund for the purposes described in the bill. Under the bill, any moneys remaining in the Fund at the end of each fiscal year that have not been expended for the purposes described in the bill shall revert to the general fund and be used exclusively to fund the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council. The bill has a delayed effective date of May 1, 2022.
Title
Legislative Staff Development Fund; created, effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 5-N) (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules (11-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-01 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 21103175D-EH1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1978EH1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Amendments by Delegate Reid agreed to |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2021-01-29 | House | Committee on Rules substitute agreed to 21103175D-H1 |
2021-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-27 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (11-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103175D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (13-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101025D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1978 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)