VA HB1976 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Council on the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children. Adds a fifth citizen member to the Virginia Council on the Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children and specifies that such member must be a representative from a military installation in Virginia. Such representative is to be appointed by the Governor.
Title
Interstate Compact on Educational Opportunity for Military Children, Council on; membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 106 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1976ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-01-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-24 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-19 | House: Reported from Education (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103494D |