VA HB1975 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; tuition and mandatory fee waivers; survivors of criminal sexual assault and certain other sex crimes. Declares eligible for counseling at no cost and a waiver of tuition and mandatory fees at any public institution of higher education any individual who, when he was under the age of 18 and a resident of the Commonwealth, became the victim of criminal sexual assault, sex trafficking, or child pornography, as evidenced by the conviction of the perpetrator of such crime. The bill provides that any individual who receives such waiver and counseling shall remain eligible if he maintains a cumulative grade point average of at least 2.5 on a scale of 4.0 or its equivalent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; tuition and mandatory fee waivers, survivors of sex crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2021-02-01HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-01HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2021-01-29HousePassed by for the day
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations (17-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2021-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education (17-Y 5-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100931D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231610.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback