VA HB1974 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle rental tax; filing returns. Removes the requirement that the rentor of a motor vehicle file a monthly motor vehicle rental tax return with the Tax Commissioner even though the dealer is not liable to remit any tax for the period covered by the return.
Title
Motor vehicle rental tax; filing returns.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0053) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 53 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1974ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (11-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100008D |